+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On August 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0472
- Effective Date August 8, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 032-025-001
On May 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Education; 007-004-000
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Education
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - May 22, 2003.
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Susan Garrett
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-000-016
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 016-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 041-014-000
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2003
- Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Removes a provision that provides that summer kindergarten program expenses may be paid from district maintenance funds.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2003: HFA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, May 29, 2003
May 20, 2003: SB0903 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2003
March 20, 2003: SB0903 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 20, 2003
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor