+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
- Session Sine Die
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2008
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 008-001-000
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2008
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2007
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass Executive; 007-005-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning child care for TANF recipients, provides that the income threshold for child care benefits must be no less than 200% (instead of 185%) of the federal poverty level. Eliminates references to particular fiscal years. Provides that the amount of a family's co-payment for child care benefits shall not exceed the sum of the following: 3% of the family's countable income, if any, that is not more than 100% of the federal poverty level; plus 7% of the family's countable income, if any, that is more than 100% of the federal poverty level but not more than 150% of the federal poverty level; plus 12% of the family's countable income, if any, that is more than 150% of the federal poverty level but not more than 200% of the federal poverty level. Provides that if a family's countable income is less than 50% of the federal poverty level, the family's co-payment shall be $1 per week. Effective immediately.