+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0471
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 036-017-003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Adopted Education; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Education; 010-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Obama
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Obama
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2003
- Second Reading
- Fiscal Note Filed as Amended with Committee Amendment No. 1
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Dan Cronin
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2003
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 006-004-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
- Assigned to Education
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to establish a toll-free telephone hotline to provide assistance to parents in helping their children with their homework. Requires the State Board to provide information on its Internet web site regarding strategies that parents can use to assist their children in successfully completing homework assignments.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Requires the State Board of Education to notify all school districts about the availability of the homework assistance information on the State Board of Education's Internet web site.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Requires the State Board of Education to notify all school districts about the availability of the homework assistance information on the State Board of Education's Internet web site.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/21-2 - from Ch. 122, par. 21-2