+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 037-017-005
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Executive; 011-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; del Valle
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2003
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000
On March 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Peter J. Roskam
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 110 ILCS 205/8 - from Ch. 144, par. 188