+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 765 ILCS 160/1-25 -
- 765 ILCS 605/18 - from Ch. 30, par. 318
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor