+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Rules; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2008
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Held in Environment and Energy
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2008
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Environment and Energy
On December 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2007
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass Executive; 007-005-000
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 220 ILCS 5/9-223 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 9-223
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor