+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Executive- Firearms
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Win Stoller
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor