+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On August 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0297
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 017-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2019
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
- Arrived in House
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
- Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 017-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person may not operate a motor vehicle on a roadway while using an electronic communication device to watch or stream video.
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that the definition of "electronic communication device" does not include a global positioning system or navigation system or a device that is physically or electronically integrated into the motor vehicle.