+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0385
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 034-016-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2015
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-038-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Esther Golar
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Steve Stadelman
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 011-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that arrests or charges not initiated by arrest resulting in orders of supervision, including orders of supervision for municipal ordinance violations, successfully completed by the petitioner, except certain excluded offenses, may be sealed 2 years (rather than 3 years if the petitioner has never been convicted of a criminal offense or 4 years if the petitioner had been convicted of a criminal offense) after the termination of petitioner's last sentence. Provides that convictions for non-excluded non-felony offenses and certain Class 4 felony and first offender probation dispositions may be sealed 3 (rather than 4) years after the termination of the petitioner's last sentence.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Drug Court Treatment Act. Reinserts the provisions of the bill. Adds that a defendant may be admitted into a drug court program post-adjudication only with the approval of the court.