+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jack McGuire
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jack McGuire
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 30, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Noland
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Noland
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass Executive; 007-005-000
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Provides that if the amount that the State Board of Education will pay to a school district from fiscal year 2008 appropriations, as estimated on April 1, 2008, is less than the amount that the State Board paid to the district from fiscal year 2007 appropriations, then the State Board shall make a fiscal year 2008 transitional assistance payment to the district in an amount equal to the difference between the estimated amount to be paid from fiscal year 2008 appropriations and the amount paid from fiscal year 2007 appropriations. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/24A-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 24A-1