+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (57)
On November 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0698
- Filed Without Signature
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
On September 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On August 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 046-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Local Government
On August 8, 2007 in the House:
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-005-000
On August 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - August 9, 2007
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
On August 7, 2007 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. James H. Meyer
On August 4, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 10, 2007
On July 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 4, 2007
On July 30, 2007 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Telecommunications Committee; 016-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Telecommunications Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Telecommunications Committee
On July 9, 2007 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mike Boland
On June 30, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2007
On June 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Telecommunications Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2007
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine
- Recalled to Second Reading
On June 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine
On June 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Local Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
On May 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2007
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass Executive; 007-005-000
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Emergency Telephone System Act. Authorizes the transfer of moneys in the Emergency Telephone System Fund to a participating fire protection district to reimburse volunteer firefighters who man remote telephone switching facilities when dedicated 9-1-1 lines are down.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Emergency Telephone System Act. Authorizes the transfer of moneys in the Emergency Telephone System Fund to a participating fire protection district to reimburse volunteer firefighters who man remote telephone switching facilities when dedicated 9-1-1 lines are down.
+ − Statute Amended
- 70 ILCS 5/3.2 - from Ch. 15 1/2, par. 68.3b
+ − Votes (3)
August 9, 2007: HCA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, August 09, 2007
August 8, 2007: SB0837 - Third Reading - Wednesday, August 08, 2007
June 20, 2007: SB0837 - Third Reading - Wednesday, June 20, 2007
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor