+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 5/1.1 - from Ch. 48, par. 2a.1
+ − Vote
March 24, 2021: SB0835 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor