+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On July 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0302
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 21, 2005
On June 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On May 18, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 12, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 010-000-000
On April 28, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 19, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-002-000
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce & Economic Development; 008-000-000
On April 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Commerce & Economic Development
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Rules
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary G. Dahl
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Local Government
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2005
- Do Pass Local Government; 006-004-000
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the redevelopment project in the TIF District created by an ordinance adopted on May 20, 1985 by the Village of Wheeling must be completed by December 31 of the 33rd year (now, the 23rd year) after the year in which the ordinance was adopted. Effective immediately.