+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (52)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-1096
- Effective Date June 1, 2007
- Governor Certifies Changes
On December 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Returned to Governor for Certification
On November 29, 2006 in the Senate:
- Both Houses Accepted Amendatory Veto
On November 29, 2006 in the House:
- Accept Amendatory Veto - House Passed 101-003-000
On November 27, 2006 in the House:
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Rep. Ron Stephens
On November 16, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 28, 2006
- Arrived in House
On November 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Accept Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 053-000-000
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Approved for Consideration Rules
On November 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 15, 2006
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules
On August 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On June 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 4, 2006 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 2, 2006 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On May 1, 2006 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 5, 2006
On November 3, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On October 27, 2005 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On October 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Watson
- Recalled to Second Reading
On October 27, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On October 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 007-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
On October 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 26, 2005
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Frank C. Watson
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
On July 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On April 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Extended to December 31, 2005
On April 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 13, 2005
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2005
- Do Pass Local Government; 006-004-000
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Southwestern Illinois Development Authority Act. Provides that the territorial jurisdiction of the Authority shall be expanded to include the geographic area within the boundaries of Bond County. Adds a member to the Board of Directors of the Authority who is appointed by the chairman of the county board of Bond County and makes corresponding changes. Provides that the duty of the Authority includes development within Clinton and Bond counties.