+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Revenue
- Re-assigned to Revenue
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Tax Credits
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Assigned to Revenue
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 5/101 - from Ch. 120, par. 1-101
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor