+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On April 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter
- Recalled to Second Reading
On March 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 007-000-000
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance
On March 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass Executive; 007-005-000
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the state Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Requires the Department of Central Management Services to develop and implement a 3-year pilot program of collaborative prevention and wellness services for State employees with diabetes residing in Cook or Champaign County. Provides that the program shall be funded through appropriations from the Diabetes Research Checkoff Fund. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 40 ILCS 5/3-103 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-103
+ − Vote
March 30, 2007: SB0811 - Third Reading - Friday, March 30, 2007
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor