+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-001
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Syverson
- Recalled to Second Reading
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Rules
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 011-000-000
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that the sugar consumption study shall be conducted subject to appropriation