+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wendell E. Jones
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor