+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Insurance Mandates and Special Issues
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine