+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Lost; 013-039-001
On March 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 2, 2005
- Second Reading
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2005
- Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-001-000
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Todd Sieben
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Todd Sieben
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the extension limitation exemption applies to those extensions made for payments of principal and interest on bonds issued before July 1, 2006 (instead of July 1, 2005) for the purpose of financing a retrofit program to replace steam pipes.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 11, 2005: SB0080 - Third Reading - Monday, April 11, 2005
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor