+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (62)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0576
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 31, 2007
- Sent to the Governor
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-004
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-004
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02 - June 1, 2007
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Kotowski
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that a grant under the Veterans' Home Nurses' Loan Repayment Act may not exceed $5,000 per recipient per year (instead of $5,000 per year), and makes other changes concerning grants under the Act. Provides that for each year during which an individual receives a grant under the Act, he or she must fulfill a separate 12-month period as a nurse in a State veterans' home (instead of providing that a grant recipient must fulfill such a separate 12-month period for each grant that he or she is awarded). Deletes all provisions amending the Property Tax Code.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that a grant under the Veterans' Home Nurses' Loan Repayment Act may not exceed $5,000 per recipient per year (instead of $5,000 per year), and makes other changes concerning grants under the Act. Provides that for each year during which an individual receives a grant under the Act, he or she must fulfill a separate 12-month period as a nurse in a State veterans' home (instead of providing that a grant recipient must fulfill such a separate 12-month period for each grant that he or she is awarded). Deletes all provisions amending the Property Tax Code.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Veterans' Home Nurses' Loan Repayment Act. Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to establish a program to award grants of up to $5,000 per year to nurses who commit to working in veterans' homes in Illinois. Sets forth requirements for the program. Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Act to establish a post-traumatic stress disorder outpatient counseling program and sets forth requirements for the program. Requires the Department to create a list of honorably discharged veterans who are interested in working on a volunteer basis on projects that restore Illinois' natural habitat. Amends the Property Tax Code. Creates a homestead exemption for disabled veterans. Sets forth the amount of the exemption based on the percentage of service-connected disability of the veteran. Provides that the exemption carries over to the benefit of the veteran's surviving spouse. Contains other provisions. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
In the Veterans' Home Nurses' Loan Repayment Act, requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to require (instead of encourage) grant recipients to use the grant to repay educational loans. Makes a technical correction in an introductory clause.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -