+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0257
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael K. Smith
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 021-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 011-000-000
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Held in Education
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Removes language that requires the IEP team to specifically address certain factors in the development of the individualized education program for a student who has a disability on the autism spectrum. Removes language providing that consideration of these factors shall result in the clarification of a school district's responsibility to deliver appropriate educational services for children with disabilities on the autism spectrum, but must not be construed to require or mandate any specific services.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/14-8.02 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-8.02
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2007: SB0079 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 22, 2007
March 22, 2007: SB0079 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 22, 2007
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor