+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On August 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0519
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Filed Without Signature
On June 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Registration and Regulation Committee; 014-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Registration and Regulation Committee
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On February 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2003
- Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Held in Licensed Activities
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Licensed Activities
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On January 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Nursing and Advanced Practice Nursing Act. Requires the Department of Professional Regulation to make available to the public the requirements for licensure, including requirements for licensure by endorsement, in English and Spanish on the internet through the Department's World Wide Web site. Requires the Department to establish an e-mail link to the Department for information on the requirements for licensure, with replies available in English and Spanish.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2003: SB0078 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 07, 2003
March 24, 2003: SB0078 - Third Reading - Monday, March 24, 2003
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor