+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
- Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed November 18, 2003
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Override Amendatory Veto - Consideration Postponed
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 4, 2003
- Governor Amendatory Veto
- Sent to the Governor
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 034-022-002
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Executive; 008-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - May 30, 2003
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond
- Sponsor Removed Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William B. Black
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2003
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-016-002
- Verified
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Creates the Physical Fitness Facility Medical Emergency Preparedness Act. Requires various indoor physical fitness facilities to develop and implement a plan for responding to medical emergencies and to file a copy of the plan with the Department of Public Health. Requires each such facility to have at least one automated external defibrillator (AED) on the facility premises and to have a trained AED user on staff. Requires the Department to adopt rules to ensure coordination with local emergency medical services systems regarding the placement and use of AEDs in physical fitness facilities. Authorizes the Department to inspect facilities to investigate complaints and ensure compliance with the Act. Authorizes civil monetary penalties for violations of the Act. Contains provisions concerning civil liability in connection with the purchase or use of an AED. Establishes a time frame for compliance with the Act. Amends the State Mandates Act to provide that no reimbursement by the State is required for the implementation of any mandate created by this amendatory Act. Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act to provide a tax exemption for private physical fitness facilities in connection with the purchase of AEDs. Amends the Automated External Defibrillator Act to provide that (i) a unit of State or local government, or school district (as well as a "person") is not liable for civil damages as a result of an act or omission involving the use of an AED, (ii) "an" AED user (instead of "a trained" AED user) is not liable for such damages, and (iii) the provisions concerning exemption from civil liability do not apply to a public hospital.
+ − Statute Amended
- 225 ILCS 10/2 - from Ch. 23, par. 2212