+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Rules
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed Sen. Louis S. Viverito; , Cullerton, Hendon, Petka and Roskam, Motion to Re-refer, pursuant to Senate Rule 3-7. Re-referred to the Senate Rules Committee.
On March 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2005
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor