+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On December 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0620
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date December 15, 2003
On December 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On November 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Financial Institutions; 009-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Financial Institutions
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
On November 19, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions Committee; 013-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On November 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On November 19, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-003
On November 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-November 20, 2003
On November 18, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
On November 17, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On June 1, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Verified
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-016-002
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Banking Act. Adds the purchase of stock in a Federal Home Loan Bank to the list of purchases and holdings that are exempt from the limitations imposed in the specified Sections of the Act. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 205 ILCS 5/16.1 - from Ch. 17, par. 323.1
+ − Votes (3)
November 20, 2003: HFA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, November 20, 2003
November 19, 2003: SB0771 - Third Reading - Wednesday, November 19, 2003
March 27, 2003: SB0771 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 27, 2003
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor