+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On July 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0230
- Effective Date January 1, 2006
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
On May 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000
On May 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 24, 2005.
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Deanna Demuzio
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Education
On May 20, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On May 18, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 12, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 11, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On April 27, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Demuzio
- Recalled to Second Reading
On April 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Education; 008-000-000
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
On April 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2005
- Do Pass Education; 007-000-000
On March 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Interagency Coordinating Council Act to require the Council to develop a comprehensive plan to increase the availability of school personnel in this State with LBS II - Transition Specialist certification. Requires the plan to be implemented beginning no later than September 1, 2006.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Interagency Coordinating Council Act to require the Council to develop a comprehensive plan to increase the availability of school personnel in this State with LBS II - Transition Specialist certification. Requires the plan to be implemented beginning no later than September 1, 2006.