+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0197
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-003-000
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 015-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that a board of trustees may (i) appoint a non-resident or a resident that has not resided in the district for one year to be a highway commissioner, or (ii) contract with a neighboring township to provide highway commissioner services if: (1) the district is within a township with no incorporated town; (2) the township is a population of less than 500; and (3) no qualified candidate who has resided in the township for at least one year is willing to serve as highway commissioner.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 605 ILCS 5/1-101 - from Ch. 121, par. 1-101
- 605 ILCS 5/6-115 - from Ch. 121, par. 6-115
+ − Votes (5)
May 21, 2019: SB0765 - Third Reading
May 9, 2019: SB0765 - Counties & Townships
April 12, 2019: SB0765 - Third Reading
March 20, 2019: SFA0001 - Local Government
March 6, 2019: SB0765 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor