+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0555
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
On May 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Health & Human Services; 008-003-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health & Human Services
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Miguel del Valle
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - May 22, 2003.
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-012-006
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-022-002
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2003
- Second Reading
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2003
- Do Pass as Amended Health & Human Services; 006-004-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
On February 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On January 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the nutrition outreach and public education program is to be established by the Department of Human Services instead of the Department of Public Health.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the nutrition outreach and public education program is to be established by the Department of Human Services instead of the Department of Public Health.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2003: HFA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, May 29, 2003
May 20, 2003: SB0076 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2003
March 19, 2003: SB0076 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 19, 2003
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor