+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chuck Weaver
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood
+ − Statute Amended
- 25 ILCS 170/6 - from Ch. 63, par. 176
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor