+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (56)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0221
- Effective Date January 1, 2020; Some provisions
- Effective Date August 9, 2019; Some provisions
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 1, 2020; Some provisions
- Sent to the Governor
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Melinda Bush
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - June 2, 2019
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 013-000-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-000-000
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-003-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Villivalam
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 012-000-000
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
- Do Pass as Amended Labor; 012-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
- Assigned to Labor
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the engrossed bill, and makes the following changes: Creates the Workplace Transparency Act. Limits the terms of employment agreements that restrict specified employee rights with respect to allegations of unlawful conduct. Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Division of Professional Regulation of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation must exchange information with the Department of Human Rights regarding recommendations received regarding a licensee or candidate for licensure who has committed a civil rights violation that may lead to the refusal, suspension, or revocation of a license from the Division of Professional Regulation. Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Requires the Department of Human Rights to adopt a model sexual harassment prevention training program and provides that all employers shall use the model or establish a training program that equals or exceeds the minimum standards provided by the model. Makes other changes concerning: definitions; procedures following an employer's failure to post required notices; employer disclosure requirements, and bar and restaurant sexual harassment policies and prevention training. Makes a corresponding change in the Freedom of Information Act. Creates the Sexual Harassment Victim Representation Act. Provides that in any proceeding in which a victim who is a member of a union has accused a perpetrator who is a member of the same union, the victim and the perpetrator may not be represented in the proceeding by the same union representative. Amends the Victims' Economic Security and Safety Act. Defines "gender violence" and makes the Act applicable in instances of gender violence. Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Modifies the disclosure of economic interests Article to provide for separate provisions concerning statements of economic interests to be filed with the Secretary of State and the county clerk respectively. Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act and the Lobbyist Registration Act to require annual participation in harassment and discrimination prevention training. Further amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Makes changes concerning: rights of persons subjected to discrimination, harassment, or sexual harassment; jurisdiction and duties of Executive Inspectors General, the Executive Ethics Commission, the Legislative Inspector General, and the Legislative Ethics Commission; complaint process, reporting, and independent review of allegations of sexual harassment made against an elected official; and other matters. Contains severability language. Effective January 1, 2020, except (i) the Hotel and Casino Employee Safety Act takes effect July 1, 2020; and (ii) the changes to the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act, the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act, and the Lobbyist Registration Act take effect immediately.
Senate Amendment 002
Adds a definition. Defines the term "sexual assault" to mean: (1) an act of sexual conduct, as defined in Section 11-0.1 of the Criminal Code of 2012; or (2) any act of sexual penetration, as defined in Section 11-0.1 of the Criminal Code of 2012 and includes, without limitation, acts prohibited under Sections 11-1.20 through 11-1.60 of the Criminal Code of 2012.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with provisions substantially similar to the introduced bill with the following changes: defines the terms "casino employer" and "hotel employer"; provides for the utilization of a safety device rather than a panic button; requires time off to be granted to file criminal complaints rather than sign police complaints; removes requirement that anti-harassment policies be posted in Polish; limits economic damage awards to $350 per incident; deletes the home rule preemption; provides that before a representative of employees may bring a claim on behalf of employees, the employer must be given 15 calendar days within which to correct the violation. Effective July 1, 2020.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (40)
- New Act -
- 5 ILCS 140/7.5 -
- 20 ILCS 2105/2105-15 -
- 710 ILCS 5/1 - from Ch. 10, par. 101
- 775 ILCS 5/1-103 - from Ch. 68, par. 1-103
- 775 ILCS 5/2-101 - from Ch. 68, par. 2-101
- 775 ILCS 5/2-102 - from Ch. 68, par. 2-102
- 775 ILCS 5/2-108 new -
- 775 ILCS 5/2-109 new -
- 775 ILCS 5/2-110 new -
- 775 ILCS 5/7-109.1 - from Ch. 68, par. 7-109.1
- 775 ILCS 5/7A-102 - from Ch. 68, par. 7A-102
- 775 ILCS 5/8-109 - from Ch. 68, par. 8-109
- 775 ILCS 5/8-109.1 new -
- 820 ILCS 180/5 -
- 820 ILCS 180/10 -
- 820 ILCS 180/15 -
- 820 ILCS 180/20 -
- 820 ILCS 180/25 -
- 820 ILCS 180/30 -
- 820 ILCS 180/45 -
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-101 - from Ch. 127, par. 604A-101
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-101.5 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-102 - from Ch. 127, par. 604A-102
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-105 - from Ch. 127, par. 604A-105
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-106 - from Ch. 127, par. 604A-106
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-106.5 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-107 - from Ch. 127, par. 604A-107
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-108 -
- 5 ILCS 430/5-10.5 -
- 5 ILCS 430/20-5 -
- 5 ILCS 430/20-10 -
- 5 ILCS 430/20-50 -
- 5 ILCS 430/20-63 new -
- 5 ILCS 430/25-5 -
- 5 ILCS 430/25-10 -
- 5 ILCS 430/25-50 -
- 5 ILCS 430/25-63 new -
- 5 ILCS 430/70-5 -
- 25 ILCS 170/4.7 -