+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0871
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 21, 2010
- Sent to the Governor
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - October 30, 2009
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-037-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 041-013-000
- Passed Both Houses
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Executive Committee; Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2009
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 041-008-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 15, 2009
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2009
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2009
- Second Reading
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009
- Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides for the issuance or renewal of a license authorizing the sale of alcoholic liquor incidental to the sale of food within a restaurant that is established in a premises that is located in a municipality with a population in excess of 1,000,000 inhabitants and within 100 feet of a school if certain conditions are met. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides for the issuance or renewal of a license authorizing the sale of alcoholic liquor incidental to the sale of food within a restaurant that is established in a premises that is located in a municipality with a population in excess of 1,000,000 inhabitants and within 100 feet of a school if certain conditions are met. Effective immediately.