+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
- Second Reading
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2017: SB0747 - Third Reading
February 16, 2017: SB0747 - Licensed Activities and Pensions
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor