+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Public Health
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
- Second Reading
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. John G. Mulroe
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
- Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 005-003-000
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
- Postponed - Public Health
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Public Health
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2017: SB0741 - Public Health
March 28, 2017: SCA0001 - Public Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor