+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor