+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (58)
- Total Veto Stands
- Placed Calendar Total Veto November 16, 2016
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Governor Vetoed
- Sent to the Governor
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-003-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 037-018-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ron Sandack
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Rep. Litsea E. Wallace Moved Note Request is Inapplicable
- Motion Prevailed
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-046-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Prevailed 065-048-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Request as Amended is Inapplicable
- Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Motion - Move to Previous Question Rep. William Davis
- Motion Prevailed 072-045-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-019-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015
- Do Pass Human Services; 005-003-000
- Postponed - Human Services
- Postponed - Human Services
- Postponed - Human Services
- Assigned to Human Services
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall (rather than to the extent resources permit, the Department shall) provide child care services to specified persons. Expands the list of categories of families and children (rather than families) the Department shall cover to include: (i) families that are not recipients of TANF benefits and that need child care assistance to participate in education and training activities; (ii) children engaged in the State's child welfare system; and (iii) homeless children. Provides that, from July 1, 2016 through June 30, 2017, the specified threshold must be no less than 200% of the then current federal poverty level for each family size; and, beginning July 1, 2017, the specified threshold must be no less than 250% of the then current federal poverty level for each family size (rather than providing that, through and including fiscal year 2007, the specified threshold must be no less than 50% of the then current State median income for each family size; and beginning in fiscal year 2008, the specified threshold must be no less than 185% of the then current federal poverty level for each family size). Requires the Department to provide child care services to all children who are eligible for assistance and are under age 13 or who are under age 19 and under court supervision or have physical or mental incapacities as documented by a statement from a local health provider or other health professional. Effective July 1, 2016.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 305 ILCS 5/4-1.6 - from Ch. 23, par. 4-1.6
- 305 ILCS 5/9A-11 - from Ch. 23, par. 9A-11