+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 26, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0167
- Sent to the Governor
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-006-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Rachelle Crowe
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2021
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-016-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-001-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel Didech
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Crowe
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Rachelle Crowe
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
- Assigned to Executive
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the engrossed bill, and makes the following change: In the Electronic Wills and Remote Witnesses Act, provides that, effective March 26, 2020 and ending 30 days after the expiration of the Governor's emergency declaration regarding COVID-19, a notarial act or an act of witnessing may be performed through means of 2-way audio-video communication technology that allows for direct contemporaneous interaction by sight and sound between the individual signing the document, the witness, and the notary public. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Electronic Wills and Remote Witnesses Act. Provides that an electronic will shall be executed by the testator or by some person in the testator's presence and at the testator's direction, and attested to in the testator's presence by 2 or more credible witnesses. Provides for the revocation of an electronic will. Provides that an electronic will is a digital asset and any person or business in possession of an electronic will is a custodian. Provides for certified copies. Provides that a person may witness any document, other than a will, using audio-video communication between the individual's signing the document and the witness. Provides for remote attestation for a will. Provides methods for determining a signer's or testator's identity. Provides for the verification of an electronic will when a petition to have an electronic will admitted to probate is filed. Provides for: admission of a paper copy of an electronic will; admission of a will attested to by a witness who is physically present; admission of a will attested to by a remote witness; and admission of a will signed under the Electronic Commerce Security Act. Provides that nothing prohibits any party from introducing evidence of fraud, forgery, compulsion, or other improper conduct which in the opinion of the court is deemed sufficient to invalidate the will when being admitted. Provides for: formal proof of a will with a remote witness; formal proof of an electronic will; and formal proof of a will witnessed under the Electronic Commerce Security Act. Makes corresponding changes in the Electronic Commerce Security Act and the Probate Act of 1975. Effective immediately.