+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On June 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0012
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 4, 2003
On May 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - May 23, 2003
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 009-000-000
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-023-001
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor Committee; 009-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Labor Committee
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2003
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Labor Committee
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-016-002
- Verified
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 735 ILCS 5/1-101 - from Ch. 110, par. 1-101