+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0534
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2019
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Glowiak
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill, and makes the following changes: (1) removes a provision defining "Eskimos or other aboriginal people of Alaska"; (2) modifies the definition of "Native American" to have the same meaning as "American Indian or Alaska Native" as provided under the Illinois Human Rights Act; and (3) removes a provision concerning State agency affirmative action and equal employment goals. Makes conforming changes.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Native American Employment Plan Act. Provides for the Native American Employment Plan. Requires the Department of Central Management Services to develop and implement plans to increase the number of Native Americans employed by State agencies and the number of Native Americans employed by State agencies at supervisory, technical, professional, and managerial levels. Provides that the Department shall prepare and revise annually a Native American Employment Plan in consultation with individuals and organizations knowledgeable on this subject and with the Native American Employment Plan Advisory Council. Requires the Department to report to the General Assembly each State agency's activities that implement the Native American Employment Plan. Requires the Department to monitor compliance with the Native American Employment Plan. Provides requirements for State agency affirmative action and equal employment opportunity goals. Creates the Native American Employment Plan Advisory Council. Provides for the membership, meetings, duties, and other requirements of the Council. Provides that the Native American Employment Plan Advisory Council shall receive administrative support from the Department of Central Management Services and shall issue an annual report of its activities each year on or before February 1, beginning February 1, 2021. Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Adds Native Americans and the Native American Employment Plan to provisions concerning State agency affirmative action and equal employment opportunity goals. Defines terms. Provides purpose provisions. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 15 ILCS 50/1 -
- New Act -
- 20 ILCS 405/405-125 - was 20 ILCS 405/67.31