+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/12-201 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 12-201
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor