+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0605
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 1, 2020; Some Provisions
- Effective Date December 31, 2019; Some Provisions
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 018-000-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 29, 2019
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Amends Public Act 101-400 to provide that specified Sections (rather than the whole Public Act) take effect on July 1, 2020 and the rest of the Act takes effect on December 31, 2019. Amends the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Act. Provides that insurance coverage for an owner or operator of a drycleaning facility first commences for a purchaser only after payment of the full annual premium due for the applicable program year. Grants the Environmental Protection Agency the power to pay eligible claims in accordance with coverage provided under the Act. Provides that for calendar year 2020, the annual assessment paid by owners and operators of inactive drycleaning facilities is due on or before October 1, 2020, and on February 1 for each subsequent calendar year. Provides that a reapplication for a drycleaner facility license and original payment receipts shall be submitted to the Agency (currently, the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Council). Makes other changes.