+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor