+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (55)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0245
- Effective Date August 3, 2015
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-001-001
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 021-000-000
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 041-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Raoul
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 014-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 30, 2015
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Education
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
- Postponed - Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
- Postponed - Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Postponed - Education
- Assigned to Education
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
Senate Amendment 005
Provides for a school-specific (rather than venue-specific) emergency action plan. Requires the plan to be posted at all venues utilized by the school (rather than all venues). Removes a provision requiring the school-specific emergency action plan to be rehearsed annually.
Senate Amendment 004
Removes a reference to a "licensed healthcare professional" otherwise holding a professional license from the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation in the field of healthcare. With respect to a student and the student's parent or guardian or another person with legal authority providing consent, adds a reference to an athletic trainer's written statement being disclosed to the appropriate persons. Makes other changes concerning athletic trainers.
Senate Amendment 003
Provides that a park district is subject to and shall comply with the Youth Sports Concussion Safety Act if the park district is directly responsible for organizing and providing a sponsored youth sports activity as a youth sports league by registering the players and selecting the coaches (instead of if the park district offers a sponsored youth sports activity as a youth sports league).
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Youth Sports Concussion Safety Act that applies to youth sports activities sponsored or sanctioned by a youth sports league, other than interscholastic athletic activities. Provides that each youth sports league with players who participate in any youth-sponsored sports activity sponsored or sanctioned by the youth sports league is encouraged to make available educational materials that describe the nature and risks of concussions and head injuries. Amends the Park District Code to provide that park districts are subject to the Act. Amends the School Code. Repeals provisions of the Code concerning concussions and head injuries and student athletes. Instead, sets forth provisions concerning concussions and head injuries and student athletes that apply to public and private elementary and secondary schools, including charter schools. Effective immediately.