+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0299
- Effective Date August 6, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
- Arrived in House
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
- Second Reading
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 014-000-000
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Removes language establishing a time period before which a person convicted of offenses defined in the Liquor Control Act of 1934 may apply for a school bus driver permit or CDL with a school bus driver endorsement.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 15 ILCS 335/4 - from Ch. 124, par. 24
- 625 ILCS 5/6-106.1 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-106.1
- 625 ILCS 5/6-205 -
- 625 ILCS 5/6-206 -
- 625 ILCS 5/6-508 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-508
- 730 ILCS 5/5-6-3.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-6-3.1