+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2019
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 1, 2019
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 6, 2019: SB0688 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor