+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2009
- Second Reading
On April 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009
- Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statute Amended
- 215 ILCS 125/6-1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1418.1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor