+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On July 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0866
- Effective Date January 1, 2013
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Esther Golar
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes
- Recalled to Second Reading
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 009-000-000
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2012
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
On January 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On November 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2011
On October 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 10, 2011
On October 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 25, 2011
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On July 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011
- Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. In provisions concerning a facility's safe resident handling policy: (1) adds definitions; (2) requires training of nurses and other direct resident care providers on safe lifting policies and techniques and current lifting equipment; (3) requires that a facility's policy include a process for fostering and maintaining resident safety, dignity, self-determination, and choice; and (4) provides that safe lifting teams must receive specialized, in-depth training that includes certain specified features.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2012: SB0680 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 16, 2012
March 28, 2012: SB0680 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 28, 2012
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor