+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0464
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 8, 2003
On June 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
On May 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted State Government; 008-000-000
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - May 15, 2003
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-004
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-002-003
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Mattie Hunter
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Dale E. Risinger
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 11, 2003
- Do Pass State Government; 006-001-000
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes all substantive changes. Amends the Attorney General Act. Establishes an Immigrant Assistance Program within the Office of the Attorney General to assess the needs of the State's immigrant population with regard to access to government and other services and to provide education and outreach services. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
May 28, 2003: HCA0001 - Concurrence - Wednesday, May 28, 2003
May 13, 2003: SB0680 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 13, 2003
April 3, 2003: SB0680 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 03, 2003
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor