+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On June 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Rules; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Revenue
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 1, 2006
- Approved for Consideration Rules
On November 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Extended to January 9, 2007
On July 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On April 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Extended to December 31, 2005
On April 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 13, 2005
On March 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2005
- Do Pass Revenue; 006-003-000
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 505/20 - from Ch. 120, par. 434
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor