+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0217
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
On May 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 007-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - May 23, 2003
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-001-000
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 017-000-000
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-001
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes the amendatory provisions of the bill. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for an employer to impose a restriction that has the effect of prohibiting a language from being spoken by an employee in communications that are unrelated to the employee's duties. Defines "language".
+ − Statute Amended
- 775 ILCS 5/2-102 - from Ch. 68, par. 2-102